Trustees FALKLAND SURGERY PATIENTS PARTICIPATION GROUP
Charity number: 1106886

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN BARKER | Chair | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Terence Arthur Harrison | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Martyn Rees | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lloyd Davies | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Curtis | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bettine Jane Bly | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Ashley Barnett | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HILLS | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN ARTHUR EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.