BURTON CHINESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activities are: 1. to provide a contact point for members of the Chinese community. 2. The provision of emotional support and confidential advice as needed. 3. Providing meeting space for culture events, educational classes, Mandarin lesson for adults and children, and for senior members get together from the local Chinese community. 4. Chineses Culture awareness training workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 July 2004: Standard registration
- 20 May 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.73k | £35.15k | £40.20k | £41.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.64k | £28.62k | £37.38k | £43.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 29 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 09 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 14 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 12 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 12 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 16 August 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 21 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING TRAINING FOR ADULT MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY (HEREAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE BENEFICIARIES) IN BURTON, EAST STAFFORDSHIRE AND SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT. 2. TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFICIARIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3. TO RELIEVE MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
BURTON, EAST STAFFORDSHIRE AND SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window