Accounts and annual returns WIPE YOUR TEARS

Charity Number: 1103897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 April 2024 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 April 2024 285 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 February 2022 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 February 2022 229 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window