St Marys Byfleet PTA & Friends

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ST Marys PTA organise Summer & Christmas Fairs, Quiz Nights, School discos, Pamper & Shopping nights, Cake Sales and Toy Sales to raise funds to purchase equipment for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 June 2004: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S BYFLEET (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Ann Campbell | Chair | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Green | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Anthony Waddle | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paulina Rakowska | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.49k | £14.01k | £8.73k | £28.06k | £20.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.12k | £10.78k | £19.67k | £20.63k | £15.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 November 2023 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 December 2022 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 APRIL 2004 as amended on 16 Oct 2019 as amended on 02 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
HART ROAD
BYFLEET
WEST BYFLEET
KT14 7NH
- Phone:
- 07897994447
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window