BIBI WA SASA PROJECTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
Governance
- 27 May 2004: Standard registration
- 24 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- BSP (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF AFRICAN SWAHILI SPEAKING WOMEN AND THEIR FAMILIES. B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR HEALTH PROMOTION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR AFRICAN SWAHILI WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN, IRRESPECTIVE OF ETHNIC ORIGIN OR RELIGIOUS BELIEF IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE KENTISH TOWN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window