Financial history RAINDROPS

Charity number: 1105692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £23.50k £14.89k £15.46k £14.52k £13.83k
Total expenditure £16.52k £11.90k £18.25k £14.28k £10.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A