THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR AFFECTIVE DISORDERS

Charity Number: 1105075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promote research into affective disorders.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £8,502
Total expenditure: £26,091

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ISAD (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR ALLAN YOUNG Chair
None on record
Dr Jair Constante Soares Trustee 21 September 2018
None on record
Kathleen Ries Merikangas Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record
Dr Mark Andrew Frye Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record
Eric Ruhe Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record
Prof Mohammad Alsuwaidan Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record
PROFESSOR ANTHONY CLEARE Trustee 25 October 2013
None on record
Dr Roger Martin Pinder Trustee 27 February 2004
None on record
DR SAGAR PARIKH Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR SIDNEY KENNEDY Trustee
None on record
PROF JAN SCOTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £17.93k £39.29k £14.05k £27.48k £8.50k
Total expenditure £27.21k £9.48k £12.53k £16.35k £26.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 20 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
INSTITUTE OF PSYCHIATRY
16 DE CRESPIGNY PARK
LONDON
SE5 8AF
Phone:
02078480088