Financial history ADAGE DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1105910
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013
Total gross income £9.64k £8.60k £9.95k £9.15k £9.71k
Total expenditure £9.53k £8.59k £9.90k £9.05k £9.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A