SAMARA SKILLS TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 October 2004: Standard registration
- 05 October 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FIRST STEPS (Working name)
- HUMANITAS SKILLS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND INFORMATION ON SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THE EFFICIENCY OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR, INCLUDING SERVICE DELIVERY, STRATEGIC AND ORGANISATIONAL MANAGEMENT AND MARKETING AND RESOURCE RAISING; WHERE THE "VOLUNTARY SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS: * CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AD WALES; AND * "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window