THE MIRACLE NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the christian Religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Philip Whiting | Trustee | 23 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Campbell | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Patrick | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Daniel John Strodl | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.95k | £50.63k | £33.47k | £34.65k | £43.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.18k | £42.17k | £32.25k | £36.43k | £33.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 FEBRUARY AND 1 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 204
Holcroft Court
Clipstone Street
London
W1W 5DJ
- Phone:
- 020 3538 6163
- Email:
- info@miracles.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window