LOVE AND JOY MINISTRIES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Love & Joy Ministries advances the Christian faith through the medium of music, dance and drama and by demonstrating the Gospel through practical help to the most vulnerable in the community,including homeless children,young people,excluded groups and the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Kenya
- South Africa
- The Gambia
- Uganda
Governance
- 29 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR TANI OMIDEYI | Chair |
|
||||||
Uchechi Ezinwanne Ugwu | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Olatunde Shosanya | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Anna Hawley | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV ROGER IAN SUTTON | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pastor John Adereti | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Helen Jayne Hawley | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.85k | £215.08k | £387.14k | £219.25k | £277.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.94k | £138.35k | £257.15k | £231.18k | £364.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 NOV 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 MAR 2016 as amended on 31 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY (THE 'OBJECTS') ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACROSS THE WORLD(IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS MEMORANDUM) AND THE PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF MUSIC, DANCE AND DRAMA AND ALSO BY DEMONSTRATING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH PRACTICAL HELP TO THE MOST VULNERABLE IN THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING HOMELESS CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, THE SICK AND ELDERLY AND IN PARTICULAR BY: - 3.1.1 HOLDING MEETINGS FOR WORSHIP AND EVANGELISM 3.1.2 SUPPORTING OTHER CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR OBJECTIVES 3.1.3 SUPPORTING THE HOMELESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION, TECHNICAL HELP, COUNSELLING AND ACCOMMODATION 3.1.4 SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF YOUTH CLUBS, HOLIDAY TIME PLAY SCHEMES, SKILLS WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT PROGRAMMES 3.1.5 SUPPORTING THE SICK AND THE ELDERLY THROUGH ORGANISED VISITS AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF GIFTS DONATED BY THE MORE FORTUNATE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY 3.1.6 SUPPORTING CHURCHES AND OTHER COMMUNITY GROUPS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CHOIRS, DRAMA GROUPS, DANCE GROUPS, RECORDING FACILITIES, CONCERTS AND EVANGELICAL EVENTS; 3.1.7 PROVIDING PASTORAL SUPPORT TO CHURCHES AND MINISTRIES ACROSS THE WORLD; AND 3.2 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE UNITED KINGDOM, KENYA AND UGANDA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIVERPOOL LIGHTHOUSE
OAKFIELD ROAD
WALTON
LIVERPOOL
L4 0UF
- Phone:
- 01514762342
- Email:
- connect@ljmaoc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window