COED HIRWAUN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to inform and organise for the village of Coed Hirwaun, of activeties and other issues that affect them
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 28 May 2004: Standard registration
- 10 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHCA (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/04/2015 | 11/04/2016 | 11/04/2017 | 11/04/2018 | 11/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | £5.18k | £4.45k | £1.64k | £1.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.95k | £4.52k | £2.95k | £1.72k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 11 April 2019 | 04 February 2021 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 April 2018 | 11 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 April 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COED HIRWAUN, MARGAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE VILLAGE BOUNDARIES (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS;
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF COED HIRWAUN, MARGAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE VILLAGE BOUNDARIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window