FRIENDS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fund was established in May 2004 to collect and disburse gifts and bequests for the benefit of the University of Sydney
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
Governance
- 26 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELISSA HARDEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CECIL DAUTH AO LVO | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS STREET | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MAVYN LYLE-SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR ANDREW COATS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTON EISDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325 | £319 | £29.05k | £97.04k | £3.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £723 | £11.40k | £47.64k | £70.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR ANY EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY, NEW SOUTH WALES, AUSTRALIA, AND PAST AND PRESENT STUDENTS
Area of benefit
THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY, NEW SOUTH WALES, AUSTRALIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Lady Cross Business Park
Hollow Lane
Dormansland
LINGFIELD
Surrey
RH7 6PB
- Phone:
- 01342 871910
- Email:
- sydney@chapel-york.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window