THE BRITISH BLUE CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT, PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREEDING OF THE BRITSH BLUE BREED OF LIVESTOCK AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 February 2005: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH BELGIAN BLUE CATTLE SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda MORGAN | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Price | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Hall | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE VIVIEN MORRISON | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY PATERSON | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BARBER | Trustee | 31 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Neachell | Trustee | 25 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
John O'Kell | Trustee | 25 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sebastian Haste | Trustee | 25 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert Steven PATTINSON | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN THOMAS HOUGH | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRAHAM BRINDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLAN JAMES WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.85k | £197.67k | £149.02k | £168.07k | £165.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.90k | £182.48k | £139.69k | £161.11k | £179.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JULY 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 MAY 1997, 12 MAY 1998 AND 20 JANUARY 2005. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT, PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREEDING OF THE BELGIAN BLUE BREED OF LIVESTOCK AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLME HOUSE
THE DALE
AINSTABLE
CARLISLE
CA4 9RH
- Phone:
- 01768870522
- Email:
- info@britishbluecattle.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window