Accounts and annual returns GOODNEWS BIBLE CHURCH

Charity Number: 1104286
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 12 December 2024 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 12 December 2024 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 30 November 2023 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 30 November 2023 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 26 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 26 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 26 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window