THE NORTHAMPTON & LAMPORT RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of the Northampton to Market Harborough Railway Line and heritage railway equipment. Providing manpower to staff the Northampton & Lamport Railway. Training of members in historic skills relating to maintainance and restoration of historic and vintage railway stock and equipment. Education of the public in railway history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 02 November 2004: Standard registration
- 09 June 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 June 2020: Funds transferred to 1172398 NORTHAMPTON AND LAMPORT RAILWAY CIO
- NLR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.25k | £9.34k | £4.49k | £9.65k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.23k | £10.27k | £12.92k | £14.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 11 March 2020 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 13 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 15 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 21/03/2015
Charitable objects
1) THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE HISTORIC NORTHAMPTON TO MARKET HARBOROUGH RAILWAY LINE, ITS STRUCTURES, ASSOCIATED ROLLING STOCK AND HISTORY. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE TECHNIQUES AND METHODS FOR CONSERVATION AND OPERATION OF STEAM AND DIESEL ENGINES AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT AND BUILDINGS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN SUCH AREAS
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTON TO MARKET HARBOROUGH RAILWAY LINE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window