SMARDEN SCHOOL P.T.F.A.

Charity Number: 1104322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising and providing a link between parents and teachers for Smarden Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £13,357
Total expenditure: £14,894

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF SMARDEN PRIMARY (FOSP) PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Piper Chair 16 March 2023
None on record
Jessica Brogan Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Hayley Dawn Tucker Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Jonathan Andrew Broughton Turner Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Rebecca Kayleigh Quinn Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Genevieve King Trustee 13 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.80k £17.61k £5.12k £13.23k £13.36k
Total expenditure £5.93k £11.73k £14.52k £5.95k £14.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 October 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Smarden Cp School
Pluckley Road
Smarden
ASHFORD
Kent
TN27 8ND
Phone:
07990821192
Website:

No information available