Financial history HARVEST CHURCH LONDON

Charity Number: 1104220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £600.49k £531.41k £564.67k £655.48k £677.59k
Total expenditure £473.62k £414.98k £390.48k £540.95k £466.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.09k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £630.88k £538.57k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £515.20k £469.46k £428.68k £24.50k £17.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £156 £91 £192 £91 £14.62k
Income - Other £85.14k £61.86k £135.81k £0 £106.73k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £322.51k £242.75k £232.55k £357.51k £298.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds £151.11k £172.23k £157.93k £183.44k £167.54k
Expenditure - Governance £66.42k £67.06k £60.81k £7.37k £15.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £46.43k £65.30k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0