SAMPHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the poverty and distress of former detainees by providing basic amenities, information and support, which will enable them to participate in the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 November 2004: Standard registration
- DOVER DETAINEE VISITORS GROUP (Working name)
- SAMPHIRE (Working name)
- VISITOR GROUP (Working name)
- THE DOVER DETAINEE VISITOR GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Louise Howden | Chair | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Celia Diane Walters | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Floortje Hoette | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Strange | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Howden | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miriam wood | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.59k | £205.50k | £170.57k | £303.59k | £308.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.49k | £166.87k | £169.56k | £253.17k | £325.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.25k | £10.00k | N/A | £8.90k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG MIGRANT COMMUNITIES (INCLUDING THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED IMMIGRATION DETENTION) BY: 1. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF MIGRANT COMMUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; 2. INCREASING AND COORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF MIGRANT COMMUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, AND TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO ADDRESS THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY; 3. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING MIGRANTS (INCLUDING THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED IMMIGRATION DETENTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Samphire BizNav Accountants
Unit 5
North Court,Armstrong Road
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME15 6JZ
- Phone:
- 01304242755
- Email:
- julie@samphireproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window