THE HAMPSHIRE CALEDONIAN PIPE BAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 July 2004: Standard registration
- 30 November 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HAMPSHIRE CALEDONIAN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/10/2005 | 26/10/2006 | 01/10/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | £11.59k | £9.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.37k | £5.18k | £5.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 26 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2007 | 25 February 2009 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 October 2006 | 26 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2006 | 26 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 26 October 2005 | 31 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED 15 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF PIPE MUSIC IN EFFORT TO ENCOURAGE, IMPROVE, AND PROMOTE, THE PLAYING OF BAGPIPES MUSIC TO ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY BY WAY OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, RECITALS AND MARCHES AND ANY OTHER MEANS THOUGHT APPROPRIATE, WHILST BEING FREE OF ANY POLITICAL, SECTARIAN, OR RELIGIOUS AFFILIATIONS OR DOGMAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window