Financial history SALE GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.99k £7.14k £347 £5.79k £11.19k
Total expenditure £3.10k £2.58k £2.85k £2.12k £4.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A