Financial history FRIENDS OF BRIDEKIRK DOVENBY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.67k £5.99k £4.98k £37.42k £3.99k
Total expenditure £3.61k £3.81k £2.15k £27.05k £19.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A