MISSING WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Missing Wales is a charity dedicated to helping missing people in Wales, their family and those who care for them. The Confidential Helpline will endeavour to make contact with missing people of all ages to assure others of their safety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2004: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 October 2010: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.58k | £569 | £8.90k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | £375 | £4.96k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 18 October 2010 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 01 March 2009 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED AT A MEETING DATED 16 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF MISSING PERSONS IN WALES BY THE PROVISION OF A 24 HR 7 DAYS A WEEK HELPLINE.
Area of benefit
WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window