CORNERSTONE CARE IN CONFIDENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COUNSELLING AND ADVICE FOR PEOPLE EXPERIENCING CRISIS PREGNANCIES, OR UNDERGOING STRESS FOLLOWING A TERMINATION OR MISCARRIAGE. PROVIDING NON-DIRECTIVE ONGOING SUPPORT WHATEVER DECISION IS REACHED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 June 2004: Standard registration
- 12 January 2021: Funds received from 1108376 NEWMARKET PREGNANCY SUPPORT CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Johannes | Chair | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juliette Mapimhidze | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wilma Kotzenberg | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lusmore | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIR COOPER | Trustee | 18 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.96k | £57.08k | £54.28k | £85.63k | £116.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.92k | £35.01k | £42.76k | £75.81k | £141.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £5.00k | £1.63k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 7 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON WOMEN WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL; B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WOMEN'S HEALTH; C) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE COUNSELLING AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, DISTRESS OR POVERTY DURING OR AS A RESULT OF PREGNANCY OR FOLLOWING AN ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH, LOSS OF A CHILD OR SEXUAL ABUSE; D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH MAY CONVENIENTLY BE CARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cornerstone Care In Confidence
1 Trinity Place
Hartford Road
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE29 3QA
- Phone:
- 07760146411
- Email:
- info@pregnancyadvice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window