Accounts and annual returns GEORGIE'S FUND RAISING MONEY FOR NEUROBLASTOMA RESEARCH
Charity Number: 1104842
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 May 2010 | 29 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 May 2009 | 16 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 May 2008 | 21 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2008 | 21 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 May 2007 | 04 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2007 | 04 February 2008 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window