STREET CHILD RESCUE-TANZANIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote street child issues in Tanzania. Funding education for individual former street boys in Tanzania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Tanzania
Governance
- 26 July 2004: Standard registration
- 31 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- STREET CHILD RESCUE - TANZANA (Working name)
- SAFE HAVENS-TANZANIA (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/07/2015 | 27/07/2016 | 27/07/2017 | 27/07/2018 | 27/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 July 2019 | 24 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 July 2018 | 24 September 2019 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 2004, AS AMENDED 30 JUNE 2004 AND 5TH JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG HOMELESS CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE STREET CHILD PROJECT BY THE PROVISION OF SHELTER, FOOD, EDUCATION AND OTHER SUCH SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFIEND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window