Accounts and annual returns THE DEZNA ROBINS JONES CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1104252
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 March 2023 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2022 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2022 324 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2021 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2021 263 days late Download Open in new window