Trustees EXETER U3A
Charity Number: 1104480

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Rutherford Smith | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Steven Hall | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Rosenfeld | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Hydar | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Barwell | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Louise Harper | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Donald Murray | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Dominique Nater-Andreae | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Jane Hannah Morgan | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Ancell | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.