COMPASSION AND CARE INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COMPASSION AND CARE INTERNATIONAL IDENTIFIES NEEDS AROUND THE WORLD, BOTH LONG-TERM AND EMERGENCY, AND RAISES AWARENESS OF THESE THROUGH WRITTEN APPEALS, SEMINARS AND PUBLIC EVENTS. FUNDS OR GOODS RECEIVED IN RESPONSE TO THIS PUBLICITY ARE DISTRIBUTED IN THE DESTINATION COUNTRIES THROUGH PEOPLE WHO ARE PERSONALLY KNOWN TO ONE OR MORE OF THE TRUSTEES OR BY ONE OR MORE OF THE TRUSTEES THEMSELVES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Cameroon
- Egypt
- Kenya
- Philippines
- Romania
- Sierra Leone
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HADLUM | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WHYTE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILLIDA JANE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIANA ZUCCHI WHYTE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.89k | £4.97k | £5.92k | £3.24k | £4.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.91k | £5.24k | £5.29k | £4.60k | £6.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAY 2004, AS AMENDED 27 JULY 2004 AND 6 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WORLDWIDE; AND 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
INTERNATIONAL BIBLE TRAINING INSTIT
HOOK PLACE
CUCKFIELD ROAD
BURGESS HILL
RH15 8RF
- Phone:
- 01444248383
- Email:
- admin@ibti.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window