CANNOCK CHASE ORPHEUS MALE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Choir this year performed no concerts this year The Choir was unable to recruit A new Musical Director and our accompanist retired.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
Governance
- 10 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SMALL | Chair | 05 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHEAL McHALE | Trustee | 24 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Newell | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM TOWERS | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHEAL HOARE | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR D G ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD DYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM THOMAS ROBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.30k | £9.31k | £7.15k | £7.15k | £6.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.03k | £9.85k | £7.73k | £7.73k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED ON 29 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
A. THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE. B. TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 ANSON ROAD
GREAT WYRLEY
WALSALL
WS6 6JE
- Phone:
- 01922419318
- Email:
- d.dgrobinson@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window