KENTISH TOWN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kentish Town Community Centre promotes the benefit of the people living in, working in, receiving education in or visiting Kentish Town. We run a Youth Service and provide many activities for older people. We have an onsite foodbank 'The Pantry' and provide advice services. We also offer rooms for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £142,408 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
Governance
- 10 June 2004: Standard registration
- 16 December 2020: Funds received from 1140617 TOGETHER WE CREATE CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Humphries | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Guy Robin Fraser Willis | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Joanne Lynch | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Sanders | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HARVEY | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £311.50k | £363.74k | £219.58k | £327.46k | £209.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.47k | £285.13k | £299.71k | £317.40k | £301.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £80.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £188.99k | £136.45k | £20.00k | £60.00k | £142.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN, WORKING IN, RECEIVING EDUCATION IN OR VISITING THE CAVERSHAM AREA IN KENTISH TOWN EDGED IN BLUE ON THE ANNEXED PLAN (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS (SEE ANNEXED PLAN FOR BOUNDARIES); 2. ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
PEOPLE LIVING IN, WORKING IN, RECEIVING EDUCATION IN OR VISITING THE CAVERSHAM AREA IN KENTISH TOWN EDGED IN BLUE ON THE ANNEXED PLAN (SEE CR FILE)
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 BUSBY PLACE
LONDON
NW5 2SP
- Phone:
- 02074823212
- Email:
- centre.manager@ktcc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window