Accounts and annual returns RAISING EDUCATIONAL ETHNIC MINORITY ACHIEVEMENT PROJECT REEMAP

Charity Number: 1106424
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2015 13 June 2016 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 20 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 03 October 2014 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 20 June 2014 On Time