Financial history THE CAMPDEN CHARITIES TRUSTEE

Charity number: 1104616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.04m £3.05m £3.41m £4.17m £4.40m
Total expenditure £3.76m £3.40m £3.78m £4.09m £4.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £14 £0 £110 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £63.99k £93.04k £43.98k £122.86k £57.95k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.96m £2.95m £3.36m £4.04m £4.32m
Income - Other £15.57k £4.35k £5.93k £5.02k £24.18k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.76m £2.35m £2.68m £2.90m £3.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £761.39k £740.22k £801.57k £880.49k £1.12m
Expenditure - Governance £246.67k £294.14k £2.23m £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £277.60k £422.00k £449.38k £487.12k £487.27k
Expenditure - Investment management £761.39k £740.22k £801.57k £880.49k £1.12m
Expenditure - Other £246.67k £308.64k £303.51k £308.31k £286.43k