Financial history FLITWICK EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1109671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £99.57k £70.56k £129.39k £128.38k £165.63k
Total expenditure £89.46k £48.46k £119.82k £148.70k £159.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A