Financial history PROJECT ART WORKS

Charity number: 1104301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £599.58k £1.16m £952.15k £1.47m £1.16m
Total expenditure £749.10k £708.95k £922.00k £1.15m £1.34m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £165.08k £41.26k N/A £589.03k £598.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £530.34k £1.11m £807.33k £1.33m £960.93k
Income - Other trading activities £65.46k £50.30k £42.33k £136.43k £59.79k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £102.45k £0 £128.02k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.79k £2.07k £51 £1.23k £15.73k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £748.63k £707.05k £904.93k £1.14m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £470 £1.90k £17.07k £15.68k £18.12k
Expenditure - Governance £85.99k £4.68k £0 £7.38k £15.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0