Trustees PROJECT ART WORKS
Charity number: 1104301

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kimberley Jane Balukiewicz | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Helen Hooper | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Pugh | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Elaine Sexton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nick Ewbank | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Young | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Cannell | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE WHISTLER-MACFARLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.