Accounts and annual returns ESTHER MINISTRIES UK PARTNERS

Charity number: 1104656
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2016 13 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 22 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 28 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required