AREA TRAINING AND ACTIVITY CENTRE (ATAC) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 youth club sessions p/wk, computer classes beginners class, Book, Video & CD exchange, bacon buttie morning, information & advice, short mat bowling, exercise classes, arts & craft, room hire, dancing, film nights, geneaolgy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £374 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 11 June 2004: Standard registration
- ATAC COMMUNITY HALL (Working name)
- ATAC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacek Jerzy Juszczyk | Chair | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Woods | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Swindon | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Woods | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Langdown | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
IVAN TENAX HEWITT | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Bexfield | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bexfield | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.08k | £25.00k | £29.15k | £6.54k | £10.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.61k | £9.83k | £11.62k | £19.59k | £16.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | £374 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF WIDDRINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AS THE COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF WIDDRINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dalkeith House
Grangemoor Road
Widdrington
Morpeth
NE61 5PU
- Phone:
- 01670790219
- Email:
- mail@atac-ne.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window