FURNESS MULTI-CULTURAL COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with diverse ethnic communities including Asylum Seekers, Refugees and their families. Services include Youth & Community work, advocacy, hate crime support, education & training. We support individuals with a range of issues. These issues are complex due to immigration status, racism & discrimination. We deliver youth provision, community outreach, group sessions, activities and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £44,600 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 August 2004: Standard registration
- FMCF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Ross | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ashton | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ryder | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Nicholas Flitcroft BA Hons | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ryder | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mujame Morgan Katjiuanjo | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Kenneth Wicks | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Wealleans-Turner | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|||||
KLEANTH LABO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.19k | £66.92k | £75.42k | £123.18k | £174.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.39k | £32.16k | £51.02k | £94.20k | £103.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.72k | £44.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 AUGUST 2003, AS AMENDED 3 AUGUST 2004. as amended on 14 Jan 2020 as amended on 16 Jul 2024 as amended on 16 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
To promote and racial and religious harmony in Barrow and Furness for the benefit of the public by: ? providing a local hub and outreach service offering advice, support, education and training ? youth and community work to people seeking asylum, refugees and people from diverse ethnic communities including adults, children, young people and their families, ? any other charitable means as the trustees from time to time determine
Area of benefit
FURNESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cooke's Studio
104 Abbey Road
BARROW-IN-FURNESS
Cumbria
LA14 5QR
- Phone:
- 01229 481405
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window