LITTLE TREASURES (BARNET) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of both medical and non-medical supplies and services to the Neo-natal and Children's departments at Barnet Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Barnet
Governance
- 07 December 2004: Standard registration
- 06 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LITTLE TREASURES (BARNET) LIMITD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.06k | £818 | £2.23k | £2.03k | £142 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.32k | £4.46k | £1.66k | £2.83k | £2.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 19 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 16 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 NOVEMBER 2003, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 8 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 25 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF SICKNESS PRIMARILY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND SERVICES TO SUPPORT THE CHILDREN SERVICES OF BARNET HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
BARNET HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window