Financial history THE KIMILILI TRUST

Charity Number: 1106889
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014
Total gross income £12.73k £14.18k £13.25k £12.56k £7.13k
Total expenditure £12.83k £10.48k £18.10k £18.17k £13.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A