ENCOURAGE SURVIVORS OF CULTS AND ABUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EnCourage provides support to survivors of cults, spiritual abuse, abusive groups or relationships and abusive family environments through the provision of: counselling, psychotherapy, telephone support, befriending, practical advice, advocacy, mentoring and education about cults and spiritual abuse. EnCourage provides supervision and training to professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 July 2004: Standard registration
- 02 April 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- CLEARWATERS OPEN DOOR TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £172 | £593 | £740 | £369 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £741 | £329 | £510 | £124 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS A RESULT OF CONTACT WITH CULTS, ABUSIVE GROUPS OR RELATIONSHIPS, OR AN ABUSIVE FAMILY ENVIRONMENT, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, BEFRIENDING, MENTORING, EDUCATION, COUNSELLING, PSYCHOTHERAPY, ACCOMMODATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND ADVOCACY, AND THROUGH THE TRAINING AND SUPERVISION OF INDIVIDUALS TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES. 2. TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH, AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CONTACT WITH CULTS, ABUSIVE GROUPS OR RELATIONSHIPS, OR ABUSIVE FAMILY ENVIRONMENTS, AND TO WORK WITH OTHER BODIES WHO HAVE EXPERTISE IN THESE AREAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window