Accounts and annual returns WEST KENT EXTRA LIMITED

Charity number: 1104621
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 December 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022
Annual return 31 December 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time