Accounts and annual returns SANDWELL ADVICE & MONEYLINK TRUST

Charity Number: 1104494
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 14 May 2013 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 14 May 2013 469 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required