THE BRIDGE "UK-ANGOLA"
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Angola
Governance
- 12 August 2004: Standard registration
- 05 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN ANGOLA AND TO SUPPORT THE ANGOLAN COMMUNITY IN THE UK, BY WORKING WITH THE ANGOLAN REFUGEES PROVIDING INFORMATION AND LEGAL ADVICE ON FAMILY, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT; PROVISION OF SOCIAL RECREATION, INTERPRETING AND TRANSLATION SERVICES.
Area of benefit
ANGOLA AND UK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window