HOPE AND MERCY FOUNDATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope and Mercy had registered as a charity in Uganda under non-government organisation. We are working with the elderly who are abandoned, isolated, sick and starving. We opened up in December 2009, working with local councils on village levels. We provide basic necessities of essential commodities, p/c and to some a hot meal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Uganda
Governance
- 02 August 2004: Standard registration
- 10 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2014 | 01/04/2015 | 01/04/2016 | 01/04/2017 | 01/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 APRIL 2004, AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PRIMARILY BY NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION IN THE UK, UGANDA AND KENYA AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UK, UGANDA AND KENYA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window