THREE CROSS SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1104822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities; Training of adult and young people in racial harmony, equality, diversity and language etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £14,545
Total expenditure: £4,044

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OPUWARI LAWSON Chair
None on record
MRS C IDONIBOYNE Trustee
None on record
OBELE LAWSON Trustee
None on record
ENEFA DOUGLAS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.95k £15.67k £12.76k £15.64k £14.55k
Total expenditure £9.51k £17.92k £12.50k £14.06k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2024 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 March 2022 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 March 2021 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 Rotherhithe New Road
LONDON
SE16 2PT
Phone:
02077206707
Website:

No information available