Governing document EASTLANDS HOMES PARTNERSHIP LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 AUG 2016 as amended on 02 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
3. THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF: (I) PROVIDING, MANAGING AND MAINTAINING HOUSING AND SOCIAL HOUSING AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES OR SERVICES IN EACH CASE FOR POOR PEOPLE OR FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; (II) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED AND CHRONICALLY SICK WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF THE COMPANY, OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH RESIDENTS LIVING WITH SUCH RESIDENTS OR RESIDENTS WITHIN THE COMMUNITIES IN WHICH THE COMPANY OPERATES, PROVIDED THAT THEY HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACIILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; (III) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY; (IV) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; AND (V) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT FROM TIME TO TIME BY A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOSUNG WITH THE REGULATOR
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.