Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MELLANUS CHURCH

Charity number: 1104792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £5.57k £3.02k £2.96k £4.58k £4.42k
Total expenditure £597 £8.47k £5.05k £442 £11.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A