BRISTOL AREA DOWN'S SYNDROME SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide advice, support, newsletter to persons with Downs Syndrome, their families friends and professionals. Arrange meetings, outings, parties, toddler sessions Health, Education and Benefits advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 28 June 2004: Standard registration
- BADSS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL SIMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 April 2021 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME BY THE PROVISION FOR SUCH PEOPLE OF FACILITIES, SERVICES AND OPPORTUNITIES THAT WILL MAXIMISE THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME WITHIN THE COUNTY AND CITY OF BRISTOL, AND THE COUNTIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND SOMERSET.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE COUNTY AND CITY OF BRISTOL, AND THE COUNTIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 JOBBINS CLOSE
CHIPPING SODBURY
BRISTOL
BS37 6ER
- Phone:
- 01454327200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window